U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00251
  • Case Name: Tirrell et al v. Edelblut et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • May 01, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 09, 2025: [Memorandum to Motion and/or Objection]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 14, 2025: [Terminate Motions PUBLIC]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
January, 2025
  • January 09, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
December, 2024
  • December 06, 2024: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 10, 2024: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 02, 2024: [Attorney Withdrawal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.