U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00222
  • Case Name: Calderia, LLC et al v. Claremont, NH, City of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Certificate of Counsel]
  • April 25, 2025: [Cure Notice - Action Requested]
  • April 25, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Mediation Statement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Objection to Motion]
  • October 02, 2024: [Preliminary Injunction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.