U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00175
  • Case Name: Taranov v. Cooper Lane Apartments, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Conference Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2025
  • January 25, 2025: [Notice - Other]
November, 2024
  • November 02, 2024: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2024
  • October 23, 2024: [Joinder]
  • October 20, 2024: [Expedite]
  • October 17, 2024: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice - Other]
  • October 04, 2024: [Transcript]
  • October 03, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum]
  • October 02, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.