U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00548
  • Case Name: Fisher v. Nashua Eye Associates, P.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 09, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • May 07, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • May 06, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • May 05, 2025: [Conference Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: [Filed Conventionally]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sealed Motion - Court Use]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 30, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Mediation Statement]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Hearing Notice]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order]
  • October 02, 2024: [Miscellaneous Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.