U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00103
  • Case Name: Avanru Development Group, Inc. v. Swanzey, NH, Town of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 06, 2025: [Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Surreply to Reply]
  • October 03, 2024: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.