U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Marden v. Bedford, NH, Town of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 01, 2025: [Trial Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue and Extend Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • October 03, 2024: [Continue and Extend Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.