U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00260
  • Case Name: Reckendorf v. Kensington, NH, Town of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • March 21, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [Objection to Motion]
  • October 04, 2024: [Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.