U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00262
  • Case Name: Committee to Save the Derry Rail Trail Tunnel et al v. Bhatt et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Cure Notice - Action Requested]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: [Continue and Extend Deadlines]
November, 2024
  • November 15, 2024: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 05, 2024: [Objection to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 08, 2024: [Return of Service Executed]
  • October 07, 2024: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • October 04, 2024: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.