U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00139
  • Case Name: Moura Dos Santos v. Dartmouth-Hitchcock Medical Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 12, 2025: [Extend Time]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Case Settlement]
December, 2024
  • December 02, 2024: [Objection to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Mediation Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.