U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00193
  • Case Name: Yager Family Management, LLC v. Elliott et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Response - not to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Consolidation Potential Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Response - not to Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2025
  • January 17, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 22, 2024: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • October 07, 2024: [Exceed]
  • October 07, 2024: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.