U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00304
  • Case Name: Fitzgerald v. Circle Internet Financial LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 16, 2024: [Surreply to Reply]
November, 2024
  • November 21, 2024: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • November 20, 2024: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Extend Time]
  • October 08, 2024: [State Court Record]
  • October 07, 2024: [Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.