U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00265
  • Case Name: Cooper et al v. White Mountain Community Health Center
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Surreply to Reply]
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extend Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Surreply to Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Leave to File]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Trial Notice]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • October 09, 2024: [Case Reassigned]
  • October 08, 2024: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • October 08, 2024: [Discovery Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.