U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00039
  • Case Name: Trowell v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice - Mail Returned]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 29, 2024: [Change of Address]
  • October 09, 2024: [Expedite]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.