U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00172
  • Case Name: Melendez v. University of New Hampshire et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 18, 2025: [Mandate]
  • April 07, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 02, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 01, 2025: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 27, 2025: [Judgment]
February, 2025
  • February 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 17, 2025: [Strike]
  • February 17, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • February 13, 2025: [Reconsideration]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Appellate Case Number]
  • October 10, 2024: [Clerks Certificate]
  • October 10, 2024: [Appeal Cover Sheet]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
  • October 10, 2024: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.