U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00319
  • Case Name: Ratcliffe v. USA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • March 11, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 04, 2025: [Notice - Other]
January, 2025
  • January 07, 2025: [Case Reassigned]
December, 2024
  • December 30, 2024: [Objection to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice - ECF]
  • October 11, 2024: [Case Assigned]
  • October 11, 2024: [Magistrate Judge Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.