U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00330
  • Case Name: Todd et al v. NH, State of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Dismiss]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.