U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00509
  • Case Name: Williams v. Bureau of Prisons
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Addendum]
  • May 08, 2025: [Attorney Withdrawal]
  • May 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 23, 2024: [Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.