U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00328
  • Case Name: Mori v. Huggins Hospital
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Surreply to Reply]
  • April 10, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
February, 2025
  • February 05, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Mediation Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.