U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00127
  • Case Name: Deveney v. Owen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 19, 2025: [Counterclaim]
December, 2024
  • December 30, 2024: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Miscellaneous Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.