U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00371
  • Case Name: Plumer v. Gardyne et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • March 24, 2025: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 19, 2025: [Excuse]
  • March 19, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Excuse]
  • March 18, 2025: [Magistrate Judge Assignment/Reminder]
  • March 18, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
  • March 18, 2025: [Excuse]
November, 2024
  • November 07, 2024: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.