U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00347
  • Case Name: Manchon v. Charlestown, NH Police Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 06, 2025: [Extend Time]
  • May 05, 2025: [Motion Referred & Submitted - Dispositive]
  • May 05, 2025: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • March 25, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • March 22, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 18, 2025: [Return of Service Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response - not to Motion]
  • March 02, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2025
  • January 14, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
November, 2024
  • November 15, 2024: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.