U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00220
  • Case Name: Button et al v. Roe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Appellate Case Number]
  • April 22, 2025: [Clerks Certificate]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appeal Cover Sheet]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 11, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Mandate]
February, 2025
  • February 13, 2025: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • February 05, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
January, 2025
  • January 13, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • January 06, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
December, 2024
  • December 28, 2024: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal]
  • December 27, 2024: [Reconsideration]
November, 2024
  • November 22, 2024: [Objection to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.