U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00356
  • Case Name: Manchester, NH, City of v. 1080 Montgomery St Limited Partnership et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 02, 2025: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons-Waiver - Request for Issuance]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 25, 2025: [Clarify]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extend Time]
  • April 17, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice - Mail Returned]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice - Mail Returned]
  • March 25, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • March 12, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
December, 2024
  • December 27, 2024: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • December 02, 2024: [Notice - Mail Returned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.