U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00141
  • Case Name: Griffin v. Burndy, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 28, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extend Time]
  • April 01, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Clarify]
December, 2024
  • December 03, 2024: [Notice - Mail Returned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.