U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00516
  • Case Name: Alfaro v. NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Attorney Withdrawal]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 18, 2025: [Surreply to Reply]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 13, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 11, 2025: [Discovery Status Conference]
December, 2024
  • December 15, 2024: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.