U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00143
  • Case Name: Delta MB LLC v. 271 South Broadway, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2025: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • March 03, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.