U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Woods v. Westbridge Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Leave to File]
  • April 24, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 08, 2025: [Surreply to Reply]
  • April 07, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 03, 2025: [Joinder]
  • April 03, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • March 14, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2025
  • January 08, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.