U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00017
  • Case Name: Nautilis Insurance Company v. Pino et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Return of Service Executed]
  • March 21, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
February, 2025
  • February 22, 2025: [Return of Service Executed]
January, 2025
  • January 09, 2025: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.