U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Willis et al v. Sig Sauer, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 30, 2025: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2025
  • February 12, 2025: [Complaint - New Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.