U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00070
  • Case Name: Codling et al v. Haverhill, NH, Town of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • May 12, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 08, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • May 06, 2025: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • May 05, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 06, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.