U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00017
  • Case Name: Next Insurance US Company v. Courtemarche et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.