U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00400
  • Case Name: Tyson et al v. Melanie Jeanne Fisheries, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue and Extend Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 24, 2025: [Magistrate Judge Assignment/Reminder]
  • March 21, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 21, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.