U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Lemieux et al v. VTG LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 19, 2025: [Case Reassigned]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 18, 2025: [Magistrate Judge Assignment/Reminder]
  • March 04, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.