U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00090
  • Case Name: Aero-Tech Pty Ltd v. Friction Sweepers International Pty Ltd. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [AO 120 Patent/Trademark]
  • May 09, 2025: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 08, 2025: [Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [AO 120 Patent/Trademark]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice - ECF]
  • March 11, 2025: [Case Assigned]
  • March 04, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.