U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00092
  • Case Name: Acadia Insurance Company, Maine v. SBP Builders LLC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 29, 2025: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • April 24, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 08, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Return of Service Executed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • March 07, 2025: [Notice - ECF]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.