U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00020
  • Case Name: Chesler v. Bureau of Vocational Rehabilitation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • May 07, 2025: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • May 05, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 22, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum to Motion and/or Objection]
  • April 09, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 27, 2025: [Addendum]
  • March 25, 2025: [Memorandum to Motion and/or Objection]
  • March 25, 2025: [Leave to File]
  • March 25, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 19, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Referred & Submitted - Dispositive]
  • March 14, 2025: [Consolidate Cases]
  • March 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Amend]
  • March 11, 2025: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • March 07, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.