U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00080
  • Case Name: Chesler v. Chesler et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Return of Service Executed]
  • March 11, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Amend]
  • March 11, 2025: [Contempt]
  • March 11, 2025: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • March 10, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.