U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00370
  • Case Name: Couture v. Jefferson Capital Systems
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • April 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 13, 2025: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Leave to File]
  • March 11, 2025: [Sanctions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.