U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00103
  • Case Name: Grant v. Grafton County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 12, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 07, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 07, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion Referred & Submitted - Dispositive]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Terminate Motions PUBLIC]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 28, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Service by Publication]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: [Service by Publication]
  • April 15, 2025: [Summons-Waiver - Request for Issuance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 11, 2025: [Addendum]
  • April 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: [Cure Notice - Action Requested]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 04, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summons-Waiver - Request for Issuance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons-Waiver - Request for Issuance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • April 01, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons-Waiver - Request for Issuance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2025: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • March 17, 2025: [Fee Paid]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons-Waiver - Request for Issuance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Filing Fee Omitted Notice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice - ECF]
  • March 11, 2025: [Case Assigned]
  • March 11, 2025: [Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • March 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.