U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00404
  • Case Name: Graham et al v. Paugus Bay Plaza Condominium Association et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • March 25, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice Regarding Service]
  • March 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.