U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00082
  • Case Name: Penny v. Hillsborough, NH, Town of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice - Mail Returned]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice - Mail Returned]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice - Mail Returned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.