U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00094
  • Case Name: Duggan v. Monadnock Disposal Service, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan]
  • May 01, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Clerk's Notice - Filing Due]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice - ECF]
  • March 11, 2025: [Case Assigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.