U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00100
  • Case Name: Chesler v. Chesler et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 14, 2025: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • March 14, 2025: [Return of Service Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Report and Recommendation]
  • March 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.