U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00091
  • Case Name: National Education Association et al v. US Department of Education et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 08, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 28, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 17, 2025: [Oral Argument]
  • April 17, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Assent to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reply to Objection to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Amend]
  • April 15, 2025: [Addendum]
  • April 14, 2025: [Exceed]
  • April 14, 2025: [File Amicus Brief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Exceed]
  • April 11, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Rescheduling Hearing Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Hearing Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 09, 2025: [Addendum]
  • April 08, 2025: [Objection to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Exceed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 31, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 28, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 24, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 21, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 21, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 21, 2025: [Endorsed Order - not on motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exceed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Exceed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 10, 2025: [Addendum]
  • March 10, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.