U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00085
  • Case Name: New England Construction Company, Inc. v. Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 06, 2025: [Case Reassigned]
  • May 06, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 06, 2025: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extend Time]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 30, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 09, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • March 26, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Addendum]
  • March 11, 2025: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 11, 2025: [ECF - Filing Error - Info Only]
  • March 11, 2025: [Addendum]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • March 11, 2025: [Cure Notice - Action Requested]
  • March 11, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • March 10, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice - Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.