U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00529
  • Case Name: Ladd et al v. Elliot Hospital
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extend Time to Object/Respond]
  • March 21, 2025: [ECF - Filing Error - Action Required]
  • March 21, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 11, 2025: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.