U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00096
  • Case Name: Courchesne et al v. Coos County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 28, 2025: [Leave to File]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • April 14, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • March 31, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 31, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons - Waiver Issued]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case Assigned]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice - ECF]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.