U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00063
  • Case Name: Fisher v. Winchester, NH, Town of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer]
  • March 13, 2025: [Return of Service Executed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extend Time to Answer]
  • March 13, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.