U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00381
  • Case Name: Levy v. Deployed Services, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Trial Notice]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Discovery Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 30, 2025: [Discovery Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Diversity Citizenship Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.