U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Hampshire

new hampshire Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Hampshire
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00031
  • Case Name: Cortez v. FCI Berlin, Warden
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Return of Service Executed as to USA/SSA]
  • April 14, 2025: [Return of Service Executed as to USA/SSA]
  • April 04, 2025: [Clerk Service]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Directing Service]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice - Mail Returned]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.